MO HB2166 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to the certification of radiologic imaging and radiation therapy personnel
Title
Creates provisions relating to the certification of radiologic imaging and radiation therapy personnel
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Porter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |