MO HB2156 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows taxpayers to classify individuals as independent contractors under certain circumstances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows taxpayers to classify individuals as independent contractors under certain circumstances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-02-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-31HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-25HouseReferred: Workforce Development(H)
2018-01-18HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback