MO HB2142 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-06 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-06 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to an income tax deduction for broadband internet expansion grants
Title
Modifies provisions relating to an income tax deduction for broadband internet expansion grants
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 6, 2024, 12:30 p.m., Senate Lounge. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 16, 2024, 9:30 a.m., SCR 1 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S) |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 3 |
2024-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2024-03-13 | House | Perfected (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-03-13 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tax Reform(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |