MO HB2116 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 12, 2014, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-12 - Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 12, 2014, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding public safety
Title
Changes the laws regarding public safety
Sponsors
Rep. Noel Torpey [R] | Rep. Dave Hinson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 12, 2014, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - AMENDED, NOTE ROOM CHANGE, SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 1 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 5, 2014, upon evening recess or adjournment, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 14 |
2014-04-28 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-04-22 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1, ha 2, ha 1 to ha 3, ha 3 as amended, ha 1 to ha 4, ha 4 as amended adopted |
2014-04-22 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-04-22 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |