MO HB211 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the enforcement and servicing of real estate loans
Title
Changes the laws regarding the enforcement and servicing of real estate loans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-31 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB211&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0211I.htm |