MO HB2104 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Restricts the use of cell-site simulator devices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricts the use of cell-site simulator devices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House: HB 2104 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: HB 2104 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 4 N: 132 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2018-03-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-08HouseEmergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 132 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 136 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-08HouseTaken Up
2018-03-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-07HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-02-28HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
2018-02-28HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-02-28HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-02-28HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-20HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-19HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-19HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-01HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-01HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-25HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-17HouseReferred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H)
2018-01-16HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-11HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback