MO HB2100 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-12 - Reported Do Not Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-12 - Reported Do Not Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that if a faculty member at a public college or university does not teach a certain percentage of classes for a course, students in that course shall receive reimbursement of a percentage of tuition
Title
Specifies that if a faculty member at a public college or university does not teach a certain percentage of classes for a course, students in that course shall receive reimbursement of a percentage of tuition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Reported Do Not Pass (H) |
2016-04-05 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2016-04-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2016-03-08 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2016-03-08 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2016-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-14 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2016-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2100&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2100I.PDF |