MO HB210 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Executive Session - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Executive Session - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the board of directors of public water supply districts
Title
Changes the laws regarding the board of directors of public water supply districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2011-03-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Utilities (H) | |
2011-01-18 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-13 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB210&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0210I.htm |