MO HB2097 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Freedom to Choose Trash Collection Services Act, which requires voter approval of any contract with mandated haulers of trash collection except in certain political subdivisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Freedom to Choose Trash Collection Services Act, which requires voter approval of any contract with mandated haulers of trash collection except in certain political subdivisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2018-03-08HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-06HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-02-21HouseReferred: Special Committee on Government Oversight(H)
2018-01-16HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-11HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback