MO HB2069 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Rural Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Rural Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to state funds for regional planning commissions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to state funds for regional planning commissions
Sponsors
Rep. Don Mayhew [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |