MO HB2061 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates new provisions relating to the sale of kratom products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates new provisions relating to the sale of kratom products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House: HB 2061 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateSecond read and referred: General Laws(S)
2020-02-20HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-02-20HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 2
2020-02-20HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-02-18HousePerfected (H)
2020-02-18HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-02-18HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-02-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-27HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-01-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-15HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback