MO HB2051 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Transportation(H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Transportation(H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Missouri Motor Vehicle Commission, and transfers to it responsibility for licensing and regulating vehicle dealers
Title
Creates the Missouri Motor Vehicle Commission, and transfers to it responsibility for licensing and regulating vehicle dealers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-21 | House | Prefiled (H) |