MO HB2051 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adds that a person commits the offense of abuse or neglect of a child if such person assists, coerces, or provides for a child to undergo any surgical or hormonal treatment for the purpose of gender reassignment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds that a person commits the offense of abuse or neglect of a child if such person assists, coerces, or provides for a child to undergo any surgical or hormonal treatment for the purpose of gender reassignment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-23HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback