MO HB2040 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to special license plates for the Association of Missouri Electric Cooperatives.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to special license plates for the Association of Missouri Electric Cooperatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |