MO HB2038 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows those licensed by the Department of Agriculture to grow, harvest, and cultivate industrial hemp

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows those licensed by the Department of Agriculture to grow, harvest, and cultivate industrial hemp

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-11 - House - House: HB 2038 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 123 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: HB 2038 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2016-04-28SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2016-04-27SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2016-04-27SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2016-04-25SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 27, 2016, noon or upon morning recess whichever comes later, SCR 1
2016-04-14SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
2016-04-11HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2016-04-11HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 0
2016-04-11HouseTaken Up
2016-04-06HousePerfected (H)
2016-04-06HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2016-04-06HouseTaken Up
2016-03-09HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2016-03-09HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2016-03-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-02-24HouseReferred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H)
2016-02-24HouseReported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 to HCA 1 and HCA 1 as amended AYES: 13 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2016-02-23HouseVoted Do Pass with Amendments (H)
2016-02-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-02-02HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2016-01-28HouseReferred: Agriculture Policy(H)
2016-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2016-01-06HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback