MO HB2034 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to industrial hemp

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to industrial hemp

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House: HB 2034 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House: HB 2034 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House: HB 2034 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2018-06-01HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-03HouseHouse Message (H)
2018-05-03HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-03HouseHouse Adopts (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-03HouseTaken Up
2018-05-03HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-02HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-02SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2018-05-02SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 adopted AYES: 29 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-02SenateSS Adopted (S)
2018-05-02SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2018-05-02SenateTaken Up
2018-04-12SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-03-26SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-03-26SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-03-22SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 26, 2018, 2:00pm, SCR 2l
2018-03-08SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
2018-02-22HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-02-22HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-22HouseTaken Up
2018-02-20HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, Ha 2 adopted
2018-02-20HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-02-20HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-02-20HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-14HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-02-12HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-06HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-30HouseAction Postponed (H)
2018-01-30HouseExecutive Session Continued
2018-01-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-11HouseReferred: Agriculture Policy(H)
2018-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2034&year=2018&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5739H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5739H.04C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5739H.04P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5739S.06C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5739S.09F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5739S.09T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/029.002.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/Journals/RDay6305021301-1383.pdf#1334
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/066.012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/rollcalls/066.011.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback