MO HB2030 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a tax deduction equal to fifty percent of the capital gain resulting from the sale of employer securities to a certain Missouri stock ownership plans
Title
Authorizes a tax deduction equal to fifty percent of the capital gain resulting from the sale of employer securities to a certain Missouri stock ownership plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 2030 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 134 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 2030 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 128 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: HB 2030 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: HB 2030 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 130 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 2030 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 128 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: HB 2030 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: HB 2030 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 130 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-28 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-10 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 128 NOES: 14 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 134 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 28 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 31, 2016, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 24 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-11 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Commerce(H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Economic Development and Business Attraction and Retention(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |