MO HB2019 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS BILL

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

APPROPRIATIONS BILL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: HB 2019 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27SenateDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2020-05-27SenateConstitutional Objection Filed (S)
2020-05-27SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2020-05-27SenateConstitutional Objection Filed (H)
2020-05-08SenateSenate Message (S)
2020-05-08SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 30 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-08SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2020-05-07SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-05-06SenateSecond read and referred: Appropriations(S)
2020-05-05HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-05-05HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-05HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-05-04HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2020-05-04HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2020-05-04HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-05-04HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-04-30HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-04-30HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-04-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-03-03HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-02-06HouseReferred: Budget(H)
2020-02-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback