MO HB2018 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-27 - Message Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates money for capital improvement projects involving the maintenance, repair, replacement, and improvement of state buildings and facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates money for capital improvement projects involving the maintenance, repair, replacement, and improvement of state buildings and facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-05 - House - House: HB 2018 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 142 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: HB 2018 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: HB 2018 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 124 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-27HouseMessage Received from the Governor, pursuant to Article IV, Section 27
2016-06-16HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2016-06-16HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2016-05-25HouseDelivered to Governor
2016-05-25HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2016-05-25HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2016-05-05HouseHouse Message (H)
2016-05-05HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0
2016-05-05HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 142 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 0
2016-05-05HouseTaken Up
2016-05-04SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS
2016-05-04SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2016-05-04SenateSS Adopted (S)
2016-05-04SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2016-05-04SenateTaken Up
2016-05-04SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2016-05-03SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2016-05-03SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2016-05-03SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2016-05-02SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, May 3, 2016, thirty minutes upo9n morning recess, SCR 2
2016-04-25SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 26, 2016, upon morning recess, SCR 2, Tuesday, May 3, 2016, thirty minutes upon morning recess SCR 2
2016-04-21SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S)
2016-04-20HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2016-04-20HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 124 NOES: 23 PRESENT: 0
2016-04-20HouseTaken Up
2016-04-18HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, and HA 4 adopted
2016-04-18HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2016-04-18HouseTaken Up
2016-04-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 22 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2016-04-06HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2016-04-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2016-03-17HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2016-03-15HouseReferred: Select Committee on Budget(H)
2016-03-14HouseRead Second Time (H)
2016-03-10HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2018&year=2016&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2018I.PDF
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/commit/HB2018C.PDF
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/perf/HB2018P.PDF
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/hlrbillspdf/2018S.04C.PDF
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/hlrbillspdf/2018S.05F.PDF
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/truly/HB2018T.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/056.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/Journals/RDay6305041715-1756.pdf#1723
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/065.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/065.005.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback