MO HB2012 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of statewide elected officials, the Judiciary, Office of the State Public Defender, and General Assembly

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of statewide elected officials, the Judiciary, Office of the State Public Defender, and General Assembly

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-10SenateSenate Message (S)
2014-09-10SenatePassed over Veto (G) - Senate concurred in line item vetoes to CCS SCS HCS HB 2012
2014-09-10SenateTaken Up
2014-09-10HouseReported to The Senate (S)
2014-09-10HousePassed over Veto (G) - Section 12.400 for contractual services for the Office of the State Public Defender.
2014-09-10HouseTaken Up
2014-06-24HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-06-24HouseVetoed in Part by Governor (G)
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-05-08HouseSenate Message (S)
2014-05-08HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 1
2014-05-08HouseSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 1
2014-05-08HouseSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2014-05-08HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-05-08HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 21
2014-05-08HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 18
2014-05-08HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-05-07HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2014-05-05HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-01HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES STREAM, FLANIGAN, PARKINSON, KELLY(45), KIRKTON
2014-05-01HouseSenate Message (S)
2014-05-01HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS SCHAEFER, SILVEY, BROWN, CURLS, WALSH
2014-05-01HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2014-05-01HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-04-30HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SCS
2014-04-30HouseTaken Up
2014-04-29SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS
2014-04-29SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 1
2014-04-29SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2014-04-29SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-04-24SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2014-04-23SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2014-04-22SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 23, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-04-17SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, April 22, 2014, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-04-16SenateHearing Cancelled (S)
2014-04-15SenateHearing Cancelled (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-04-15SenateHearing Cancelled (S) - Tuesday, April 15, 2014
2014-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Thursday, April 17, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, April 15, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-04-10SenateHearing Cancelled (S) - Appropriations Hearing Canceled for Thursday, April 10, and Friday, April 11, 2014.
2014-04-07SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 9, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2; Thursday, April 10, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2; Friday, April 10, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2. Mark-up.
2014-04-02SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 7, 2014, 1:00pm, Senate Committee Room 2; Tuesday, April 8, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-03-31SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S)
2014-03-28HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-27HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 27
2014-03-27HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-03-25HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1, ha 2 adopted
2014-03-25HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2014-03-25HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-25HouseLaid Over (H)
2014-03-25HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-25HouseLaid Over (H) - ha 2 adopted
2014-03-25HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-25HouseLaid Over (H) - ha 1 adopted
2014-03-25HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-24HouseLaid Over (H)
2014-03-24HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit (H) - six hours of total debate on Perfection
2014-03-13HouseRules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-12HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-03-12HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-03-12HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-03-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-10HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-03-06HousePublic Hearing Continued (H)
2014-02-10HouseReferred: Budget(H)
2014-02-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-02-06HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback