MO HB2011 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-10 - Senate Message (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, and distributions of the Department of Social Services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, and distributions of the Department of Social Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-10SenateSenate Message (S)
2014-09-10SenatePassed over Veto (G) - Senate concurred in line item vetoes for CCS SS SCS HCS HB 2011
2014-09-10SenateTaken Up
2014-09-10HouseReported to The Senate (S)
2014-09-10HousePassed over Veto (G) - Section 11.100 for the Missouri Mentoring Partnership; Section 11.152 for transfer to the Utilicare Stabilization Fund; Section 11.153 for the Utilicare Program; Section 11.157 for sexual assault victim assistance services and programs; Section 11.220 for an Internet-based health record system for foster children; Section 11.223 for Social Innovation Project Grants; Section 11.225 for training of foster parents; Section 11.285 for the purpose of funding the Hand Up pilot program; Section 11.440 for clinical medication therapy services; Section 11.465 for rural health clinic dental pilot project; Section 11.490 for the Community Health Access Programs (CHAPs); Section 11.527 for a medical and behavioral health home pilot project for foster care in the St. Louis region; Section 11.528 for asthma related services; Section 11.529 for a Regional Care Coordination Model.
2014-09-10HouseTaken Up
2014-06-24HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2014-06-24HouseVetoed in Part by Governor (G)
2014-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2014-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2014-05-08HouseSenate Message (S)
2014-05-08HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 25 NOES: 7
2014-05-08HouseSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 25 NOES: 7
2014-05-08HouseSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2014-05-08HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-05-08HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 45
2014-05-08HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 46
2014-05-08HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-05-07HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2014-05-06HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-06HouseConferees to Exceed Differences (H) - In Section 11.440.
2014-05-05HouseSenate Message (S)
2014-05-05HouseConferees to Exceed Differences (S) - In Section 11.440.
2014-05-05HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-05-01HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES STREAM, FLANIGAN, ALLEN, KIRKTON, LAFAVER
2014-05-01HouseSenate Message (S)
2014-05-01HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS SCHAEFER, SILVEY, BROWN, CURLS, WALSH
2014-05-01HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2014-05-01HouseHouse Message (H)
2014-04-30HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SS SCS
2014-04-30HouseTaken Up
2014-04-29SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS SCS
2014-04-29SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 24 NOES: 7
2014-04-29SenateSS Adopted (S)
2014-04-29SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-04-29SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2014-04-29SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2014-04-29SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2014-04-24SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2014-04-23SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2014-04-22SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 23, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-04-17SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, April 22, 2014, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-04-16SenateHearing Cancelled (S)
2014-04-15SenateHearing Cancelled (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-04-15SenateHearing Cancelled (S) - Tuesday, April 15, 2014
2014-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Thursday, April 17, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Tuesday, April 15, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-04-10SenateHearing Cancelled (S) - Appropriations Hearing Canceled for Thursday, April 10, and Friday, April 11, 2014.
2014-04-07SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 9, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2; Thursday, April 10, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2; Friday, April 10, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2. Mark-up.
2014-04-02SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 7, 2014, 1:00pm, Senate Committee Room 2; Tuesday, April 8, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 2
2014-03-31SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S)
2014-03-27HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2014-03-27HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 99 NOES: 52
2014-03-27HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2014-03-25HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1, ha 3, ha 4, ha 5, ha 6 adopted
2014-03-25HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2014-03-25HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-25HouseLaid Over (H) - ha 6 adopted
2014-03-25HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-25HouseLaid Over (H) - ha 4, ha 5 adopted
2014-03-25HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-25HouseLaid Over (H) - ha 3 adopted
2014-03-25HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-25HouseLaid Over (H) - ha 1 adopted
2014-03-25HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-24HouseLaid Over (H)
2014-03-24HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit (H) - six hours of total debate on Perfection
2014-03-13HouseRules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit (H)
2014-03-13HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-12HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2014-03-12HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2014-03-12HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2014-03-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2014-03-10HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2014-03-06HousePublic Hearing Continued (H)
2014-02-10HouseReferred: Budget(H)
2014-02-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2014-02-06HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback