MO HB201 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the MO HealthNet Division to implement a statewide dental delivery system to ensure recipient participation and access to providers of dental services under MO HealthNet
Title
Authorizes the MO HealthNet Division to implement a statewide dental delivery system to ensure recipient participation and access to providers of dental services under MO HealthNet
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-23 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2011-01-18 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-13 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB201&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0201I.htm |