MO HB2 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the State Board of Education and Department of Elementary and Secondary Education
Title
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the State Board of Education and Department of Elementary and Secondary Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 2 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 129 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: House: HB 2 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 129 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: HB 2 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: House: HB 2 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 129 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: HB 2 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2017-06-30 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-04 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-04 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 129 NOES: 22 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 129 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 1 |
2017-05-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-03 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2017-05-01 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-01 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS BROWN, SATER, CUNNINGHAM, CURLS, NASHEED |
2017-05-01 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-04-27 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES FITZPATRICK, ALFERMAN, ROWLAND(155), BUTLER, KENDRICK |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2017-04-26 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-04-26 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SCS as amended |
2017-04-26 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 2, SSA 1 for SA 2 as amended adopted AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Taken Up - SSA 1 for SA 1 withdrawn, SA 1 withdrawn, SA 1 to SSA 1 for Sa 2,SSA 1 FOR SA 2 as amended adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - with SA 1, SSA 1 for SA 1 and SCS |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-24 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 19, 2017, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 119 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 2 adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | SEE COMMENTS - Six (6) hours total debate on perfection, pursuant to HR 1400 |
2017-04-03 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2017-04-03 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |