MO HB1976 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases, upon voter approval, the excise tax on cigarettes from 17 cents to 75% of the national average with a specified amount to be used for tobacco use prevention and cessation purposes
Title
Increases, upon voter approval, the excise tax on cigarettes from 17 cents to 75% of the national average with a specified amount to be used for tobacco use prevention and cessation purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2012-03-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1976&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1976I.htm |