MO HB1928 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws relating to professional registration
Title
Changes the laws relating to professional registration
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Ross [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House: HB 1928 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 9, 2018, 2:00pm, SCR 1 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Professional Registration(S) |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 159 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-27 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-27 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2018-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |