MO HB1925 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a grant program for health care professionals working and residing in rural counties
Title
Establishes a grant program for health care professionals working and residing in rural counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-05-02 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-04-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Healthcare Reform(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-13 | House | Prefiled (H) |