MO HB1900 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-08 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain discriminatory practices on the basis of race
Title
Prohibits certain discriminatory practices on the basis of race
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - AMENDED - Wednesday, May 8, 2024, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - CANCELLED - Wednesday, May 1, 2024, 11:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Progress and Development(S) |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2024-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted |
2024-03-14 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-03-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-03-11 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 |
2024-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2024-02-20 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |