MO HB1898 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the offenses of unlawful use of unmanned aircraft over a correctional center, unlawful use of unmanned aircraft over an open-air facility, and unlawful use of unmanned aircraft over a mental health hospital.
Title
Creates the offenses of unlawful use of unmanned aircraft over a correctional center, unlawful use of unmanned aircraft over an open-air facility, and unlawful use of unmanned aircraft over a mental health hospital.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: HB 1898 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 1:00 p.m., Monday, April 27, 2020, Senate Chamber |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2020-03-05 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-03-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled (H) |