MO HB1895 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred: Ways and Means(H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred: Ways and Means(H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts the residential property of certain individuals from increases in assessed valuation that are not from new construction or improvements and from rate increases
Title
Exempts the residential property of certain individuals from increases in assessed valuation that are not from new construction or improvements and from rate increases
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Otto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1895&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1895I.PDF |