MO HB1878 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-27 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the substitution by a pharmacist of an interchangeable biological product for a prescribed product
Title
Changes the laws regarding the substitution by a pharmacist of an interchangeable biological product for a prescribed product
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1878&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1878I.PDF |