MO HB1873 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Student Data Protection Act
Title
Establishes the Missouri Student Data Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-10 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-10 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-03 | House | Rules - No Action Taken (H) |
2014-04-03 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2014-02-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |