MO HB187 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Crime Prevention(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Crime Prevention(H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to the participation of complainant patients or their representatives in the discipline proceedings for certain health care professionals
Title
Creates provisions relating to the participation of complainant patients or their representatives in the discipline proceedings for certain health care professionals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |