MO HB1868 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: Education(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Second read and referred: Education(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the state board of education to develop a statewide plan for minimum requirements for career and technical education (CTE) certificates.
Title
Requires the state board of education to develop a statewide plan for minimum requirements for career and technical education (CTE) certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: HB 1868 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-02-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-02-19 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2020-02-19 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-02-19 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-02-19 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Career Readiness(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-20 | House | Prefiled (H) |