MO HB1868 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a statewide hearing aid distribution program for low-come individuals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a statewide hearing aid distribution program for low-come individuals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House: HB 1868 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-14SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-11SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2018-05-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass
2018-05-09SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 11, 2018, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2018-05-09SenateReferred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S)
2018-05-07SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-25SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2018-04-04SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-02SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 8:00 a.m., Wednesday, April 4, 2018, Senate Lounge
2018-03-15SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S)
2018-03-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-08HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-08HouseTaken Up
2018-03-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-03-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-03-06HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-03-06HousePerfected (H)
2018-03-06HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2018-03-06HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-03-06HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-21HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-21HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-21HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-14HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-14HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-13HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-11HouseReferred: Children and Families(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback