MO HB1863 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the proceeds from boating safety identification card fees to be used to fund statewide boating safety initiatives
Title
Requires the proceeds from boating safety identification card fees to be used to fund statewide boating safety initiatives
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Thomas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-05-05 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-25 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-21 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-04 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |