MO HB1849 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-25 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-25 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the criteria to be followed by landlords and tenants of multifamily rental dwelling units regarding the control of bed bugs
Title
Establishes the criteria to be followed by landlords and tenants of multifamily rental dwelling units regarding the control of bed bugs
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McGhee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-18 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1849&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1849I.htm |