MO HB1838 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the expiration date of funding of basic civil legal services for certain persons
Title
Repeals the expiration date of funding of basic civil legal services for certain persons
Sponsors
Rep. David Evans [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |