MO HB1835 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Identifies particular social studies academic performance standards and learning standards for elementary and secondary education
Title
Identifies particular social studies academic performance standards and learning standards for elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-03-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |