MO HB1820 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Governor to convey specified state properties
Title
Authorizes the Governor to convey specified state properties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-10 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-18 | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 123 NOES: 022 | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 135 NOES: 011 | |
2012-05-18 | House Concurs (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 135 NOES: 011 | |
2012-05-16 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS | |
2012-05-16 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 01 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 01 | |
2012-05-16 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2012-05-10 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-17 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2012-02-27 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |