MO HB1816 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates celebratory months for each month of the year
Title
Designates celebratory months for each month of the year
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Riggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |