MO HB1810 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Iran Energy Divestment Act which bars any person or entity that invests in the energy sector in Iran from contracting with the state and political subdivisions
Title
Establishes the Iran Energy Divestment Act which bars any person or entity that invests in the energy sector in Iran from contracting with the state and political subdivisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1810&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1810I.htm |