MO HB1803 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-14 - Executive Session Scheduled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-14 - Executive Session Scheduled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the requirements for recognition as a certified school social worker
Title
Specifies the requirements for recognition as a certified school social worker
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Korman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Executive Session Scheduled | |
2012-05-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, MAY 14, 2:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-05-10 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-05-03 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-05-03 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 135 NOES: 7 | |
2012-05-01 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-05-01 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-27 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-21 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-21 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |