MO HB1797 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Approved by Governor (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Nuclear Power Plant Security Guard Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Nuclear Power Plant Security Guard Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - House: HB 1797 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 122 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: HB 1797 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 116 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: HB 1797 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-06-01HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2018-05-30HouseDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2018-05-30HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2018-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 116 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS as amended AYES: 122 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-17HouseTaken Up
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2018-05-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-05-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-05-03HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2018-05-03SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended
2018-05-03SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 adopted AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2018-05-03SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2018-05-03SenateTaken Up
2018-04-30SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2018-04-30SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2018-04-09SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2018-04-05SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 9, 2018, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
2018-03-15SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2018-03-08HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2018-03-07HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0
2018-03-07HouseTaken Up
2018-02-28HousePerfected (H)
2018-02-28HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2018-02-28HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2018-02-20HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-08HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-02-01HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-24HouseReferred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H)
2018-01-04HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-03HouseRead First Time (H)
2017-12-28HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback