MO HB1797 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Nuclear Power Plant Security Guard Act
Title
Establishes the Nuclear Power Plant Security Guard Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House: HB 1797 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 122 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: HB 1797 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 116 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: HB 1797 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: HB 1797 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 116 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: HB 1797 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-01 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 116 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-17 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS as amended AYES: 122 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-17 | House | Taken Up |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-05-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 adopted AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 9, 2018, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2018-03-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-28 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-28 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-28 | House | Prefiled (H) |