MO HB1794 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to driver's licenses
Title
Modifies provisions relating to driver's licenses
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hinman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |