MO HB1769 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the offense of filing false documents
Title
Establishes the offense of filing false documents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1769 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1769 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: HB 1769 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: HB 1769 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: HB 1769 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: HB 1769 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: HB 1769 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 101 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-01 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-18 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-05-18 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 132 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-05-18 | House | Taken Up |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-05-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-08 | Senate | SEE COMMENTS - Motion to return bill from Fiscal Oversight adopted |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 15, 2018, 9:30am, Bingham Confernce Room |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, February 26, 2018, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-01 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-01 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-01-29 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1 as amended, HA 2, HA 3 adopted |
2018-01-29 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-01-29 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-01-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-27 | House | Prefiled (H) |