MO HB1768 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to communications services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to communications services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-13 - House - House: HB 1768 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: HB 1768 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: HB 1768 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2020-07-02HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2020-05-27HouseDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2020-05-27HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2020-05-13HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-13HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-13HouseSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-13HouseSenate Submits Conference Committee Report (S)
2020-05-13HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-13HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-13HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-13HouseHouse Submits Conference Committee Report (H)
2020-05-13HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-05-12HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-05-12HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) - CCR#2
2020-05-12HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-12HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES RIGGS, MILLER, FRANCIS, ROBERTS(77), PIERSON JR.
2020-05-12HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-11HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS HEGEMAN, SATER, CRAWFORD, RIZZO, ARTHUR
2020-05-11HouseSenate Grants Conference (S)
2020-05-11HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-11HouseHouse Requests a Further Conference (H) - SS SCS as amended
2020-05-11HouseTaken Up
2020-05-11HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2020-05-07HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-06HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-06HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS HEGEMAN, SATER, CRAWFORD, RIZZO, ARTHUR
2020-05-06HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES RIGGS, MILLER, FRANCIS, ROBERTS(77), PIERSON JR.
2020-05-06HouseSenate Message (S)
2020-05-06HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2020-05-05HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-05HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
2020-05-05HouseTaken Up
2020-05-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-04-29HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-04-29SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS SCS, a.a.
2020-04-29SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - SS SCS, as amended AYES: 30 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-04-29SenateSS Adopted (S) - SS SCS, as amended
2020-04-29SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2020-04-29SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2020-04-29SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-04-29SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2020-04-29SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-04-28SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - 1:30 pm, Wednesday, April 29, 2020, Joint Committee Room (Rm 117)
2020-04-28SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-04-28SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2020-04-28SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2020-04-28SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-04-24SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 10:30 a.m., Tuesday, April 28, 2020, Senate Chamber
2020-04-07SenateSecond read and referred: Economic Development(S)
2020-03-09HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-03-09HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-09HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-03-04HousePerfected (H)
2020-03-04HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-03-04HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-03-03HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2020-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-04HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-02-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-03HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-03HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-27HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-16HouseReferred: Economic Development(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-12HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1768&year=2020&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4494H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4494H.01P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4494S.04C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4494S.07F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4494H.08S.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4494H.10S.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4494H.10T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/035.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay450429760-785.pdf#769
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/062.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/062.002.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback