MO HB175 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the collection of special assessments and delinquent property taxes
Title
Changes the laws regarding the collection of special assessments and delinquent property taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-01 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 150 NOES: 10 |
2013-05-17 | House | House Concurs (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 145 NOES: 11 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 25, 2013, 8:30 a.m., SCR 1 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: * NOES: 10 |
2013-04-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2013-04-17 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-04-04 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-04 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-04 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Rules - No Action Taken (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-04 | House | Hearing Cancelled (H) |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2013-01-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |