MO HB1741 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the death benefit for members of the County Employees' Retirement System and the defined contribution plan for employees of certain higher education institutions
Title
Changes the laws regarding the death benefit for members of the County Employees' Retirement System and the defined contribution plan for employees of certain higher education institutions
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Leara [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-26 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 000 | |
2012-04-24 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-04-24 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-12 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Committee Vote to Reconsider (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-19 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-19 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred: Retirement (H) | |
2012-02-16 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |