MO HB1733 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the "Missouri Empowerment Scholarship Accounts Program."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "Missouri Empowerment Scholarship Accounts Program."

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-01HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2020-03-18HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2020-03-12HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2020-03-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-26HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-18HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-02-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-02-06HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-12-12HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback